U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00879
  • Case Name: DENNARD et al v. ROLLINS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 08, 2025: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 03, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.