U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00918
  • Case Name: N-BAR TRADE INC. et al v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 20, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • April 04, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.