U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00520
  • Case Name: BRUZZONE v. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reopen Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.