U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00961
  • Case Name: ABBENANTE v. CHUBB CORPORATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 02, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.