U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00934
  • Case Name: ALEXANDER v. UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 03, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Not Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.