U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00958
  • Case Name: SCOTTS VALLEY BAND OF POMO INDIANS v. BURGUM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 22, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 02, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 01, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.