U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03503
  • Case Name: GAZA et al v. RUBIO
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Pre-motion Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.