U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00938
  • Case Name: JUSTICE CLIMATE FUND v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 15, 2025: [Create Case Association]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.