U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01668
  • Case Name: IXI TECHNOLOGY, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.