U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00624
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $14,087.65 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING IN 0326 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 17, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 02, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.