U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00966
  • Case Name: MIDDLE EAST BROADCASTING NETWORKS, INC. v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 01, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.