U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00967
  • Case Name: GUPTA v. RUBIO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 01, 2025: [Injunction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.