U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00977
  • Case Name: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES et al v. DUDEK et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 09, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 05, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 03, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 03, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.