U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00330
  • Case Name: STATE OF ALASKA v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 11, 2025: [Modify]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 09, 2025: [Injunction]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.