U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 06, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.