U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EHR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.