U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01002
  • Case Name: ANDERSON v. BDO USA, P.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 01, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 09, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.