U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00999
  • Case Name: ASSOCIATION FOR EDUCATION FINANCE AND POLICY, INC. et al v. MCMAHON et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 09, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 07, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 07, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.