U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WATKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.