U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01011
  • Case Name: STRONG v. FORT MYER CONSTRUCTION CORP.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 10, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • April 07, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.