U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01015
  • Case Name: WIDAKUSWARA et al v. LAKE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • April 25, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 11, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • April 09, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 08, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Case Transferred Out]
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.