U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02074
  • Case Name: ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.