U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00350
  • Case Name: RIVERA v. AVERILL et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Case Stayed]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: [Remand to Agency]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.