U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01051
  • Case Name: CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 08, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 08, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.