U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 21, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.