U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01070
  • Case Name: NORTH AMERICA'S BUILDING TRADES UNIONS et al v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.