U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00962
  • Case Name: JOHNSON v. VOLUME SERVICES, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 30, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Mediation (Circuit Executive's Office)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Appointment of Counsel for the Limited Purpose of Mediation]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono]
  • April 09, 2025: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.