U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHRISTIAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.