U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRYANT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 15, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 15, 2025: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2025: [Temporary Detention ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.