U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00535
  • Case Name: LYTTON RANCHERIA OF CALIFORNIA et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.