U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00110
  • Case Name: PETROZZI v. BARNES et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 21, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 18, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 14, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.