U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01079
  • Case Name: Southern Education Foundation v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 25, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 23, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 09, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.