U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01634
  • Case Name: THOMAS v. NELSON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.