U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01055
  • Case Name: SANTORA v. COPYRIGHT CLAIMS BOARD
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 15, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Injunction]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with other selection]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • April 11, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 10, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Not Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.