U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01083
  • Case Name: GRAYEYES v. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • April 11, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.