U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CORBIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.