U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01089
  • Case Name: LI v. LYONS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 12, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 10, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 10, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.