U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01088
  • Case Name: LYTTON RANCHERIA OF CALIFORNIA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.