U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01090
  • Case Name: Pippenger et al v. U.S. DOGE SERVICE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Electronic Summons Reissued]
  • April 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 11, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 11, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.