U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00739
  • Case Name: IANNAZZI et al v. AMAZON.COM, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Rule 26a2 Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.