U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01098
  • Case Name: BADDAM v. LYONS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 17, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.