U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01087
  • Case Name: SAADEIN-MORALES v. OFFICE OF THE COUNTY ATTORNEY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Permanent Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Large Additional Attachment(s)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 14, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 11, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 11, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.