U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01097
  • Case Name: HINGE v. LYONS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 13, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.