U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01096
  • Case Name: PATEL v. LYONS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Administrative Record]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 27, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 16, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.