U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01107
  • Case Name: SUSMAN GODFREY LLP v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Permanent Injunction]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.