U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01100
  • Case Name: MASHATTI v. LYONS
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear by Telephone or Video]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.