U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01108
  • Case Name: S.E. v. BONDI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 14, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.