U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01111
  • Case Name: PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT v. U.S. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 27, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 27, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • April 22, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.