U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01112
  • Case Name: SIERRA CLUB et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.