U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01115
  • Case Name: NATIONAL IMMIGRATION PROJECT OF THE NATIONAL LAWYERS GUILD v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.